Global Patent Index - EP 0853151 B1

EP 0853151 B1 2002-09-25 - Warping mill for threads in general with improved thread removing unit

Title (en)

Warping mill for threads in general with improved thread removing unit

Title (de)

Schäranlage mit Abzugsvorrichtung für Fadenresten

Title (fr)

Installation d'ourdissage avec dispositif pour retirer les résidus de fil

Publication

EP 0853151 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97122880 A

Priority

IT MI970021 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853151A1] A warping mill for threads in general with improved thread removing unit, comprising, between a creel (2) and a winding unit (3), a thread removing unit (4) provided with mutually opposite and motorizable rollers (11, 12) which can be removably engaged with the threads (30) in order to remove the residues of thread from bobbins of the creel (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 1/00; B65H 73/00; D02H 3/00; D02H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 73/00 (2006.01); D02H 1/00 (2006.01); D02H 3/00 (2006.01); D02H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 11/00 (2013.01); B65H 73/00 (2013.01); D02H 1/00 (2013.01); D02H 3/02 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853151 A1 19980715; EP 0853151 B1 20020925; DE 69715803 D1 20021031; DE 69715803 T2 20030515; ES 2181979 T3 20030301; IT 1289161 B1 19980929; IT MI970021 A1 19980708

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111224

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101224

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081226

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081226

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181979 T3

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715803 20021031

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001009

1999-06-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK LI

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1998-07-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI