Global Patent Index - EP 0853156 A3

EP 0853156 A3 2000-04-12 - Suction device and device for treating textile fabrics

Title (en)

Suction device and device for treating textile fabrics

Title (de)

Absaugvorrichtung und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von textilen Flächengebilden

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration et dispositif de traitement des étoffes textiles

Publication

EP 0853156 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118544 A

Priority

DE 19700503 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853156A2] A liquid extractor has a suction arm (2) with slits (2a) whither the fabric (5) is drawn by pressure. A rotating carrier (4) with several through passages sits between the slits and fabric. The carrier has a wall thickness less than 1 mm, a free cross-section greater than 30% and a polished surface. Also claimed is a fabric handler incorporating this extractor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/08 (2006.01); D06B 15/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/08 (2013.01); D06B 15/04 (2013.01); F26B 13/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853156 A2 19980715; EP 0853156 A3 20000412; DE 19700503 A1 19980716

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030614

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020722

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI