Global Patent Index - EP 0853157 B1

EP 0853157 B1 2001-12-19 - Apparatus for removing foreign matter from textile flat structure and drying the same

Title (en)

Apparatus for removing foreign matter from textile flat structure and drying the same

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Fremdstoffen aus einem textilen Flächengebilde und zum Trocknen desselben

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'enlèvement de matières étrangères d'une structure textile plane et séchage de ladite structure

Publication

EP 0853157 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100401 A

Priority

EP 97100401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853157A1] The apparatus to extract foreign matter from a textile fabric, and to dry it, has an air outlet as a jet slit (4) in the working head (1). A flow channel section (11), for a partial air volume, is at least almost at right angles to the flow direction of the jet slit (4), connected at the flow side to the air exhaust outlet at the working head (1). Also claimed is a gun to clean dirt spots on a fabric, with the working head, as an integrated manual appliance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 43/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853157 A1 19980715; EP 0853157 B1 20011219; DE 59705885 D1 20020131

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705885 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

1999-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981007

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1998-07-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI