Global Patent Index - EP 0853200 B1

EP 0853200 B1 2003-06-25 - Clutch-driven gas compressor

Title (en)

Clutch-driven gas compressor

Title (de)

Verdichter mit Antriebskupplung

Title (fr)

Compresseur avec embrayage

Publication

EP 0853200 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97310001 A

Priority

GB 9625938 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853200A2] In a clutch-driven piston and cylinder air compressor the crankcase (3) has a single closure component (19) provided between a clutch (12) and a crankshaft (6) which component closes an aperture (20) which provides access for assembly of the crankshaft to the crankcase, includes an actuator an annular cylinder (23) and a piston (24) sealingly movable therein for operating a clutch release mechanism (24,28) and occupying space included in a projection of the adjacent cylinder (14) of the compressor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/02; F04B 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/18 (2006.01); F04B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 35/01 (2013.01); F04B 35/002 (2013.01); F04B 49/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853200 A2 19980715; EP 0853200 A3 19990506; EP 0853200 B1 20030625; DE 69723042 D1 20030731; DE 69723042 T2 20040422; GB 9625938 D0 19970129

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161211

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161211

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161212

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161211

2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-08-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69723042

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723042 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020312

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991029

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-07-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI