Global Patent Index - EP 0853525 B1

EP 0853525 B1 2002-11-06 - TAPPING TOOL AND METHOD FOR DRIVING OR CONTROLLING A TAPPING TOOL WITH PRESSURIZED FLUID

Title (en)

TAPPING TOOL AND METHOD FOR DRIVING OR CONTROLLING A TAPPING TOOL WITH PRESSURIZED FLUID

Title (de)

GEWINDEBOHRWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANTREIBEN ODER STEUERN DES GEWINDEBOHRWERKZEUGS DURCH DRUCKFLUID

Title (fr)

OUTIL A FILETER ET SON PROCEDE D'ENTRAINEMENT ET DE COMMANDE A L'AIDE D'UN FLUIDE SOUS PRESSION

Publication

EP 0853525 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96922352 A

Priority

  • SE 9600861 W
  • SE 9502371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9702110A1] Threading attachment for internal or external threading comprising a spindle head (1), which is intended to be attached to a spindle on a machine tool and also a tap holder (5) with a holder body (6) in which a tap (13) is arranged during the threading work, the spindle head (1) and the tap holder (5) being extended along a joint axle. The tap holder (5) and the holder body (6) respectively has in threading position a power transmitting connection to the spindle head (1) via driving members (15, 16 and 28, 29 respectively) and is in back out position freely rotatable in relation to the spindle head (1) and arranged to be effected by a compressed medium via a driving member (18). The driving member can be a reaction turbine or an action turbine. The invention comprises also a threading method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 5/06; B23G 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23G 1/46 (2006.01); B23Q 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23Q 5/06 (2013.01); B23G 1/46 (2013.01); Y10T 408/455 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9702110 A1 19970123; AT 227189 T 20021115; AU 6325096 A 19970205; DE 69624724 D1 20021212; DE 69624724 T2 20030717; EP 0853525 A1 19980722; EP 0853525 B1 20021106; SE 507234 C2 19980427; SE 9502371 D0 19950630; SE 9502371 L 19961231; US 5934385 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030628

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624724 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227189 T 20021115

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980130

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL