Global Patent Index - EP 0853603 A4

EP 0853603 A4 2000-11-22 - QUICK CURE HYDROXYL-TERMINATED BINDER SYSTEM FOR GAS-GENERATING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

QUICK CURE HYDROXYL-TERMINATED BINDER SYSTEM FOR GAS-GENERATING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

SCHNELLHARTENDES BINDEMITTELSYSTEM MIT HYDROXYLENDGRUPPEN FUER GASERZEUGENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE LIAISON A TERMINAISON HYDROXYLE ET DURCISSEMENT RAPIDE POUR COMPOSITIONS GENERATRICES DE GAZ

Publication

EP 0853603 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96929767 A

Priority

  • US 9613827 W
  • US 53848795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9712846A1] A gas-generating composition for inflating inflation devices such as air bags, life rafts, slide chutes, and the like which comprises an oxidizer component and a hydroxyl-terminated polybutadiene binder component which does not produce hazardous compounds upon combustion. The composition further includes a curing agent and a cure catalyst so that it can be molded and quick-cured. Molded articles can be formed by injection molding or extrusion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 45/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/10 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01); C08G 18/69 (2006.01); C08L 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/10 (2013.01); C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712846 A1 19970410; AU 6903996 A 19970428; DE 69630965 D1 20040115; DE 69630965 T2 20041028; EP 0853603 A1 19980722; EP 0853603 A4 20001122; EP 0853603 B1 20031203; JP H11513354 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060808

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060802

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69630965 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOLDED GAS GENERATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A QUICK CURE HYDROXYL-TERMINATED BINDER SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING TH

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020902

2000-11-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-07-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHEFFEE, ROBERT, S.

1998-07-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LARIMER, MERLIN, W.

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980429

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE