Global Patent Index - EP 0853706 B1

EP 0853706 B1 2000-06-28 - LEVEL CROSSING

Title (en)

LEVEL CROSSING

Title (de)

SCHIENENGLEICHER BAHNÜBERGANG

Title (fr)

PASSAGE A NIVEAU

Publication

EP 0853706 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96932363 A

Priority

  • AT 9600175 W
  • AT 163495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9713037A1] A level crossing in which the roadway surface in the vicinity of the track is formed by inner and outer roadway slabs (3, 4). The inner roadway slabs (3) form an unsupported bridge across the space between the rails (5) of the track (2) and are provided along both their edges extending along the rails with projecting supporting ridges (7) by which the inner roadway slabs are supported via intermediate elastic contoured lower supports (8) made from rubber or plastic on the rail feet, and via intermediate elastic contoured upper supports (9) laterally against the rail stems (11) and upwards against the rail heads (12). The outer roadway slabs (4) are provided on their edge facing the rail with supporting ridges (15) and mounted or supported on the rails. The lower supports (8; 8') are joined to the supporting ridges (7) of the inner slabs (3; 3'; 3'', 3''') at least in the mounting section of the supporting ridges on the lower supports. Similarly, the upper supports elements (9; 9') are joined to the supporting ridges (15) of the outer roadway slabs (4; 4', 4'', 4''') at least in the mounting section of the supporting ridges on the lower supports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 21/00 (2006.01); E01C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9713037 A1 19970410; AT 194181 T 20000715; AT 404266 B 19981027; AT A163495 A 19980215; DE 59605514 D1 20000803; EP 0853706 A1 19980722; EP 0853706 B1 20000628; JP 3280674 B2 20020513; JP H11500504 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 194181 T

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605514

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080812

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605514 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194181 T 20000715

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990921

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980309

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB