Global Patent Index - EP 0853716 B1

EP 0853716 B1 2000-03-15 - ROCKER ARM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

ROCKER ARM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KIPPHEBEL FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CULBUTEUR POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0853716 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918952 A

Priority

  • DE 19631653 A
  • EP 9704209 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631653A1] A rocker arm (1) for the valve control of an internal combustion engine, in which the rocker arm is manufactured from stamped, deep drawn and subsequently heat treated, deep drawing sheet metal and characterised by the fact that the rocker arm (1) has opposite side pieces, in between which a rolling element (10) is accommodated in a rotating position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/183 (2013.01); F01L 2105/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631653 A1 19980212; EP 0853716 A1 19980722; EP 0853716 B1 20000315; JP H11514068 A 19991130; US 6003482 A 19991221; WO 9805850 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701254 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990419

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT