Global Patent Index - EP 0853731 B1

EP 0853731 B1 2000-12-06 - ELECTROHYDRAULIC CONTROL VALVE ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

ELECTROHYDRAULIC CONTROL VALVE ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE STEUERVENTILANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE A VANNES DE REGULATION ELECTROHYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 0853731 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96933364 A

Priority

  • DE 19536553 A
  • EP 9604156 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19536553A1] The invention concerns an electrohydraulic control valve arrangement (10) for controlling the movement of a hydraulic motor. The control valve arrangement (10) comprises a main control valve (11), which can be actuated by the alternating application and relieving of pressure in two control chambers, and an electrohydraulic servo-control valve (14) which operates with electronically controllable position setpoint input and mechanical actual position data feedback in order to pilot the main control valve accordingly in a manner guided by the setpoint value. The servo-control valve (14) comprises a sleeve-shaped housing element (99) which is disposed so as to be movable in a pressure-tight manner in a connection block (114) rigidly connected to the housing of the main control valve (11). The servo-control valve (14) further comprises a piston (66) which is likewise disposed so as to be movable in a pressure-tight manner in the sleeve-shaped housing element and can be driven in alternate directions by means of a controllable electric motor (131) in order to perform incremental deflections with respect to the sleeve-shaped housing element (99) for inputting the position setpoint. The housing element (99) is coupled for movement in a positive and force-locking manner to the piston (16) of the main control valve (11). The servo-control valve (14) is provided with a valve spring arrangement (118, 119) which, in the non-controlled state of the setpoint input motor (131), sets the piston (66) in the setpoint input position associated with the operationally-neutral centre position of the main control valve (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/043; F15B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F15B 9/10 (2006.01); F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F16K 3/00 (2006.01); F16K 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0435 (2013.01); F15B 9/10 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86606 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86614 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19536553 A1 19970403; AT 197985 T 20001215; EP 0853731 A2 19980722; EP 0853731 B1 20001206; JP 3242115 B2 20011225; JP H10510616 A 19981013; US 6039077 A 20000321; WO 9713074 A2 19970410; WO 9713074 A3 19970501

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606197

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100925

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050924

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2004-08-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040818

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040817

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SCHULZE, ECKEHART TRANSFER- HARTMANN & LAEMMLE GMB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606197 20010111

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197985 T 20001215

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970729

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI