Global Patent Index - EP 0853894 B1

EP 0853894 B1 2000-04-05 - Brassiere with reinforcing wires

Title (en)

Brassiere with reinforcing wires

Title (de)

Büstenhalter mit Versteifungsbügeln

Title (fr)

Soutien-gorge à armatures

Publication

EP 0853894 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100198 A

Priority

DE 29700566 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10212607A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To prevent reinforcing curved units from separating from an opening of pocket parts provided so as to vertically move, insert or take out the curved units in a brassiere having the reinforcing curved units capable of being taken out in the pocket parts. SOLUTION: This brassiere 1 equipped with reinforcing curved units 9 is obtained by providing a means, used for fixing each curved unit 9 in an inserted position within the range of each opening 10 and comprising at least one holding elements 11 and 12 attached to the brassiere 1 and having ends of the curved unit 9 additionally installed in the holding elements 11 and 12 designed to be brought to working bonds releasable from the holding elements 11 and 12.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/10 (2006.01); A41C 3/00 (2006.01); A41C 3/12 (2006.01); A41C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/0007 (2013.01); A41C 3/122 (2013.01); A41C 3/124 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29700566 U1 19980514; AR 010101 A1 20000517; AT 191318 T 20000415; AU 4929797 A 19980723; AU 704397 B2 19990422; CA 2226902 A1 19980715; CA 2226902 C 20000502; CN 1106165 C 20030423; CN 1200902 A 19981209; CZ 287499 B6 20001213; CZ 9800141 A3 19980916; DE 59800112 D1 20000511; DK 0853894 T3 20000904; EE 9800003 A 19980817; EP 0853894 A1 19980722; EP 0853894 B1 20000405; ES 2144884 T3 20000616; GR 3033563 T3 20000929; HK 1015641 A1 20040116; HR P980019 A2 19981231; HR P980019 B1 20010228; HU 220646 B1 20020328; HU 9800057 A2 20000428; HU 9800057 A3 20000628; HU 9800057 D0 19980330; ID 19512 A 19980716; IS 4645 A 19980716; JP 2923488 B2 19990726; JP H10212607 A 19980811; MY 135234 A 20080331; NO 980138 A 19980716; NO 980138 D0 19980113; PL 186448 B1 20040130; PL 324256 A1 19980720; PT 853894 E 20000929; RU 2128930 C1 19990420; SI EP0853894 T1 20000831; SK 3498 A3 19980909; TW 371261 B 19991001; US 5967876 A 19991019; YU 998 A 19990927

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070108

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060108

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060108

2005-01-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041202

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TRIUMPH INTERNATIONAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020108

2002-01-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020108

2002-01-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020108

2002-01-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020108

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010130

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-25 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20010125

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010124

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010123

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010123

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-01-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010103

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-12-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-09-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144884 T3

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800112 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19981109;LT PAYMENT 19980108;LV PAYMENT 19980108;MK PAYMENT 19981109;RO PAYMENT 19981109;SI PAYMENT 19980108

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191318 T 20000415

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOLLMANNTHALER, SIEGFRIED

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUNZ, CHRISTA-HEIDI

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLTRON, ADOLF

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990510

1999-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 981109;LT PAYMENT 980108;LV PAYMENT 980108;MK PAYMENT 981109;RO PAYMENT 981109;SI PAYMENT 980108

1999-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 980108;LV PAYMENT 980108;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980108