Global patent index - EP 0853903 A3

EP 0853903 A3 2000-12-20 - Mattress made of an elastic material

Title (en)

Mattress made of an elastic material

Title (de)

Matratze aus elastischem Material

Title (fr)

Matelas en un matériau élastique

Publication

EP 0853903 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100027 A

Priority

DE 29700100 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853903A2] The mattress of a compressible material, and especially a foam material, has a compressibility at the shoulder zone (4,5) structured with cyclic variations across the longitudinal line (I) of the mattress. The shoulder zones may have long slits (8) in the mattress body, open towards the lying support surface, and are 5-30 mm wide and 10-60 mm deep. The mattress body may be made of latex or polyurethane foam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/14; A47C 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/146 (2013.01); A47C 27/144 (2013.01); A47C 27/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29700100 U1 19970313; EP 0853903 A2 19980722; EP 0853903 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI