Global Patent Index - EP 0853915 B1

EP 0853915 B1 2002-09-18 - Soap case

Title (en)

Soap case

Title (de)

Seifenschale

Title (fr)

Porte-savon

Publication

EP 0853915 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97113142 A

Priority

KR 19970001293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853915A1] The present invention relates to a soap case (30) having a receiving portion (32) for receiving a bar of soap (300) in a standing position, and more particularly, to a soap case (30) having a receiving portion (32) for guiding the receiving of the soap (300) in a standing position and a portion formed of intentional curved side surfaces (36) and bottom surface (37) having the function of making point-contact with the received soap (300). The receiving portion (32) has a predetermined varying width (W), greater than the thickness (T) of the bar of soap (300) and less than the width W2 of the bar of soap (300) and varying depth. The bottom surface (37), of the receiving portion (32), has a slope of a predetermined angle toward a front surface (38), i.e. in the direction of receiving the bar of soap (300). A water outlet hole (34) is provided at the lowermost portion of the receiving portion (32) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/02 (2006.01); A47K 5/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853915 A1 19980722; EP 0853915 B1 20020918; CA 2211950 A1 19980717; CA 2211950 C 20050712; CN 1098664 C 20030115; CN 1187979 A 19980722; DE 69715581 D1 20021024; DE 69715581 T2 20030320; ES 2184016 T3 20030401; JP H10201658 A 19980804; KR 100188817 B1 19990601; RU 2178262 C2 20020120

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715581

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120730

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120730

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110728

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090807

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184016 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715581 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

1999-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI