Global Patent Index - EP 0854065 A3

EP 0854065 A3 2000-01-19 - Method for recognizing the acces authorization for electrical devices

Title (en)

Method for recognizing the acces authorization for electrical devices

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erkennung der Nutzungsberechtigung für elektrische Geräte und Geräte

Title (fr)

Procédé pour reconnaître l'autorisation d'accès pour dispositifs électriques

Publication

EP 0854065 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97122888 A

Priority

DE 19701056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854065A2] The appts. (5) recognises a user's code, read-in via a first special chip card (6), by comparison with a first user's code contained in a memory (9). After activation of the appts. by the special chip card, at least the content of a random data field of each further arbitrary chip card (11) is read and the content of the data field is stored in the memory as further user' code. Pref. the further chip card comprises at least one processor (12) and a coupled memory for any arbitrary, further functions. Typically the second chip card is of personalised type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 11/02; G08B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/1418 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19701056 A1 19980716; DE 19701056 C2 19981210; EP 0854065 A2 19980722; EP 0854065 A3 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60R 11/02 A, 7G 08B 13/14 B, 7G 06F 1/00 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE