Global Patent Index - EP 0854086 B1

EP 0854086 B1 2001-05-23 - Process and device for inserting separation sheets between foodstuff slices

Title (en)

Process and device for inserting separation sheets between foodstuff slices

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einbringung von Trennblättern zwischen scheibenförmig aufgeschnittene Lebensmittelprodukte

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour insérer des feuilles de séparation entre des tranches de produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 0854086 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122670 A

Priority

DE 19701340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854086A2] The method involves at least two superimposed conveyor units (1-4) which lead to a subsequent combined conveyor track (6) for the slices or portions of the product (7,8). A feeder for the separating sheets is positioned near the acute-angled junction of the conveyor units (3,4). The feeder incorporates appliances for supplying single separating sheets (9) to the juncture (5) of the slices or portions coming from the superimposed conveyor units. The feeder for the separating sheets (10) comprises a gripper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/06; B26D 7/32; B65B 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854086 A2 19980722; EP 0854086 A3 19990414; EP 0854086 B1 20010523; AT 201366 T 20010615; DE 19701340 A1 19980723

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031222

2002-12-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI NL

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 201366

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-02-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH IT LI NL

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALPMA ALPENLAND MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990319

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI NL

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI