Global Patent Index - EP 0854233 A3

EP 0854233 A3 2000-05-31 - Process and apparatus for the damping of vibrations for rolls in contacting rotation

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the damping of vibrations for rolls in contacting rotation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dämpfung von Kontaktschwingungen rotierender Walzen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour l'amortissement des vibrations de rouleaux en contact et en rotation

Publication

EP 0854233 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118892 A

Priority

DE 19652769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854233A2] To dampen the oscillations of rollers in contact with each other, especially in a paper web coating assembly, an active damping action is generated as a phase displaced counter oscillation. It is applied directly or indirectly, externally, on at least one roller bearing mounting. Also claimed is a roller assembly with at least two rollers pressed together, to form a nip between them, with each roller supported on bearing mountings at their end sides. One of the rollers, forming the nip, can be given a swing movement. Actuators (10-12) apply an external active action through a phase displaced counter oscillation, directly and/or indirectly on at least one bearing mounting (7) of a roller (1,2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00; B05C 1/08; B05C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16F 15/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/56 (2006.01); F16F 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/008 (2013.01); B65H 2515/50 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/50 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652769 A1 19980625; AT 252180 T 20031115; EP 0854233 A2 19980722; EP 0854233 A3 20000531; EP 0854233 B1 20031015; JP H10202173 A 19980804; US 2001000065 A1 20010329; US 6156158 A 20001205; US 6419794 B2 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121030

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710860

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121030

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 252180 T

- Effective date: 20121030

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710860 P 20031120

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020806

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE