Global Patent Index - EP 0854239 A3

EP 0854239 A3 2000-10-04 - Base plate for a compactor

Title (en)

Base plate for a compactor

Title (de)

Grundplatte für einen Plattenverdichter

Title (fr)

Plaque de base pour compacteur

Publication

EP 0854239 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118027 A

Priority

DE 29700741 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2226038A1] A base plate for a plate compactor, wherein the plate executes an approximately vertical vibration movement for compacting the soil, has at least one receding compaction surface in its major part in the form of a recession on its underside. It is essential that this receding compaction surface in its major pa rt be arched and/or inclined in relation to the horizontal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/046; E01C 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/34 (2006.01); E02D 3/046 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29700741 U1 19970306; CA 2226038 A1 19980717; EP 0854239 A2 19980722; EP 0854239 A3 20001004; JP H10204863 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH FR GB LI

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB LI

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI