Global Patent Index - EP 0854245 B1

EP 0854245 B1 2001-04-11 - Structure of an externally insulated construction and a construction employing such a structure

Title (en)

Structure of an externally insulated construction and a construction employing such a structure

Title (de)

Wandaufbau mit externer Isolierung und ein ein solchen Wandaufbau aufweisendes Bauwerk

Title (fr)

Structure de construction à isolation par l'extérieur, et contruction mettant en oeuvre une telle structure de construction

Publication

EP 0854245 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400034 A

Priority

FR 9700492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854245A1] The construction has a frame (15), fixing lugs (16) which are attached to the frame and extend from it and low density, expanded polystyrene insulating panels (18). The back of the panels rest on the frame and the fixing lugs are position between two adjacent panels and extend beyond the front of them. The panels are held in position with by fixing components (21) which fit over the lugs. A second frame (22) is attached to the lugs at a distance from the insulating panels and a outer concrete cladding (23) is attached to the front of the outer frame. The insulating panels have grooves which fit over parallel sections over the inner frame (26) and the joints are filled. The fixing lugs have a base (31) and a head (32) and the section between them is thin and flat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7675 (2013.01); E04B 1/7612 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854245 A1 19980722; EP 0854245 B1 20010411; AT 200543 T 20010415; DE 69800671 D1 20010517; DE 69800671 T2 20020704; DE 854245 T1 19990107; DK 0854245 T3 20010730; ES 2118701 T1 19981001; ES 2118701 T3 20010616; FR 2758580 A1 19980724; FR 2758580 B1 19990402; PT 854245 E 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120110

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200543 T

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120709

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800671

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120110

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-10-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-09-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PLACOPLATRE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-07-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120709

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101231

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-07-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2118701 T3

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800671 20010517

2001-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200543 T 20010415

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLACOPLATRE

2000-06-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRUCTURE OF AN EXTERNALLY INSULATED CONSTRUCTION AND A CONSTRUCTION EMPLOYING SUCH A STRUCTURE

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991015

1999-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-12-16 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-10-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-10-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2118701 T1

1998-10-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-09-30 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI