Global Patent Index - EP 0854252 B1

EP 0854252 B1 2000-10-04 - Covering for building

Title (en)

Covering for building

Title (de)

Gebäudehülle

Title (fr)

Couverture de bâtiment

Publication

EP 0854252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810303 A

Priority

CH 142097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854252A2] The insulation (25) is an elastic layer which can be compressed. The insulation is compressed by a given amount through the mounting points at the roof (35) through the shaft lengths of the mountings (41). The mounting has a threading (45) and a limit section to define the depth of screw threading. It has preferably a penetration point (43). The thermal insulation is preferably of mineral fibre boards, of rock wool. The vapour barrier (23) is an elastomer bitumen web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/16; E04D 3/362

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/36 (2006.01); E04D 3/362 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/3602 (2013.01); E04D 3/3603 (2013.01); E04D 3/362 (2013.01); E04D 13/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854252 A2 19980722; EP 0854252 A3 19980729; EP 0854252 B1 20001004; AT 196789 T 20001015; AT 219810 T 20020715; AT 224493 T 20021015; DE 59800286 D1 20001109; DE 59804582 D1 20020801; DE 59805613 D1 20021024; EP 0969159 A2 20000105; EP 0969159 A3 20000223; EP 0969159 B1 20020918; EP 0969160 A2 20000105; EP 0969160 A3 20000223; EP 0969160 B1 20020626

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-01-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-04-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020419

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER & CO.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FLUMROC A.G.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-08-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MEDAVA SYSTEM GMBH/WEBER SYSTEMBAU GMBH/SAINT-GOBA

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-08-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PROECKL, GERTHOLD

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-04-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010104

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800286 20001109

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-10-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196789 T 20001015

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

1999-03-03 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19980722

1999-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER & CO.

1999-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLUMROC AG

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER & CO.

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980423

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI