Global Patent Index - EP 0854268 B1

EP 0854268 B1 2000-09-13 - Blades rotor disc with threepronged blades

Title (en)

Blades rotor disc with threepronged blades

Title (de)

Beschaufelte Rotorscheibe mit dreifüssigen Schaufeln

Title (fr)

Disque aubagé à aubes tripodes

Publication

EP 0854268 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400062 A

Priority

FR 9700383 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854268A1] The blade (10) is held into the disc (1) by the interference fit of a triple root (7,8,9) into circumferential grooves (4,5,6) in the disc. The roots are stepped along the periphery of the rotor, each root lying on a different angular radius from the rotational axis of the disc. The roots are of different cross sections, as are the grooves. Each root is held against the outer edge of its groove by a shock-absorbing spring. The clearances between the roots and the grooves allow limited movement of the blades in the grooves, the system being tuned to dampen vibrations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/26 (2006.01); F01D 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/3038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854268 A1 19980722; EP 0854268 B1 20000913; CA 2227521 A1 19980716; DE 69800296 D1 20001019; DE 69800296 T2 20010329; FR 2758364 A1 19980717; FR 2758364 B1 19990212; JP H10205304 A 19980804; US 5919032 A 19990706

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060115

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060115

2004-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800296 20001019

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA MOTEURS

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000121

1999-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980127

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI