Global Patent Index - EP 0854319 B1

EP 0854319 B1 2000-06-28 - Shutter element

Title (en)

Shutter element

Title (de)

Blendenelement

Title (fr)

Cache

Publication

EP 0854319 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120800 A

Priority

EP 96120800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854319A1] The screen consists of a thin plate made of bright white, ceramic material which is transparent and scatters the light. The side of the screening element facing away from the light source has a coating which reflects light and is preferably metal or heat-resistant lacquer. A light-absorbing layer is preferably applied onto the first layer. Between the ceramic and first layer or between the first and second layers is an adhesive layer. The screening element is in the form of a prism or near semicircle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 11/00; F21V 11/08; F21V 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/00 (2006.01); F21V 11/08 (2006.01); F21V 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/08 (2013.01); F21V 11/00 (2013.01); F21V 11/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854319 A1 19980722; EP 0854319 B1 20000628; AT 194217 T 20000715

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2004-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Inventor name: WELM, KLAUS

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194217 T 20000715

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEDDERSEN-CLAUSEN, OLIVIER

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WELM, KLAUS

1999-05-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990119

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;RO;SI