Global Patent Index - EP 0854344 A3

EP 0854344 A3 2000-01-26 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0854344 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98100889 A

Priority

JP 737897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854344A2] A heat exchanger is provided with finned tubes (10) each fabricated by attaching fins (12) to a tube (11). Radial slits (13) are formed in a peripheral portion of the fin (12) to divide the peripheral portion into a plurality of segments. A portion of each of the segments is bent in an axial direction of the finned tube (10) along a bending line (14) extending from a point on the radial slit to form a plurality of bent portions (15). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854344 A2 19980722; EP 0854344 A3 20000126; EP 0854344 B1 20030723; AT 245793 T 20030815; CN 1135358 C 20040121; CN 1188890 A 19980729; JP H10206059 A 19980807

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOSHIBA K.K.

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090104

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-12-17 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIMURA, KENICHI

2003-12-17 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMADA, MINORU

2003-12-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIMURA, KENICHI

2003-12-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMADA, MINORU

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE NL

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 28F 1/36 A

2002-11-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEAT EXCHANGER

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011204

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE NL

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980120

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE NL

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI