Global Patent Index - EP 0854394 B1

EP 0854394 B1 2004-12-01 - Toner replenishing device and toner cartridge for use therein

Title (en)

Toner replenishing device and toner cartridge for use therein

Title (de)

Tonernachfüllvorrichtung und Tonerbehälter dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en toner et récipient de toner associé

Publication

EP 0854394 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98300163 A

Priority

  • JP 1771297 A
  • JP 1771397 A
  • JP 6559397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854394A2] A toner replenishing device including a mounting base (70) having a toner replenishment opening (72) formed for replenishing a hopper with a toner, and a toner cartridge (2) to be mountable on the mounting base (70) at a replenishing position at which the toner can be replenished through the toner replenishment opening (72). The mounting base (70) is provided with a replenishment opening shutter member (76), and locking means (100) for inhibiting the turning of the replenishment opening shutter member (76). When the toner cartridge (2) is mounted at the replenishing position, locking of the locking means (100) is released, and when the container of the cartridge is turned, a through-hole of the toner cartridge (2) and the toner replenishment opening (72) open. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0886 (2013.01); G03G 15/087 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0673 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0692 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H07168435 A 19950704 - SEIKO EPSON CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854394 A2 19980722; EP 0854394 A3 19991222; EP 0854394 B1 20041201; AU 5039598 A 19980723; CA 2226700 A1 19980717; DE 69827862 D1 20050105; DE 69827862 T2 20051222; EP 1293843 A2 20030319; EP 1293843 A3 20061122; ID 19584 A 19980723; SG 94701 A1 20030318; TW 380216 B 20000121; US 5848338 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69827862

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827862 P 20050105

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OKADA, MITSUHARU

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-08-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB LI

2000-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000311

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI