Global Patent Index - EP 0854437 A3

EP 0854437 A3 2002-11-13 - Positioning device with switch

Title (en)

Positioning device with switch

Title (de)

Stellelement mit Schalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de positionnement avec interrupteur

Publication

EP 0854437 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119487 A

Priority

  • DE 19647148 A
  • DE 29710446 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854437A2] The setting element (11) is fixed to the covering or base plate (13), supporting the hand (12) of the user and the handle, control column or joystick (14) extends upward, above the holder (15) for the pressure switches (16), also fixed to the base plate. The control column is located in the eccentric hole in the holder, providing inner space on one side for the operating parts of the switches. The switches can be microswitches, optoelectronic light gates, pressure sensors responding in a binary way or magnetic switches. The control column is worked by the thumb and the first finger of the hand and presses against sensor with very little actual movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 9/047; G05G 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/047 (2006.01); H01H 3/14 (2006.01); H01H 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/047 (2013.01); G05G 2009/0474 (2013.01); H01H 3/14 (2013.01); H01H 25/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854437 A2 19980722; EP 0854437 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05G 9/047 A, 7G 05G 1/20 B

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI