Global Patent Index - EP 0854450 A3

EP 0854450 A3 2001-05-02 - Method for microscopical evaluation of the tachograph discs

Title (en)

Method for microscopical evaluation of the tachograph discs

Title (de)

Verfahren für die mikroskopische Auswertung der Tachoscheiben

Title (fr)

Méthode pour l'évaluation microscopique des disques de tachygraphe

Publication

EP 0854450 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810012 A

Priority

CH 9197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854450A2] The tachometer disc records all speed changes into a plot Ä6Ü on a circular disc with the radial distance being proportional to speed Ä3Ü. In order to interpret the amount of data on the disc the image is enlarged and is scanned with the aid of a digital camera. Vector data is obtained and is entered into a file. This is then processed to obtain an interpretation of the journey.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854450 A2 19980722; EP 0854450 A3 20010502; CH 696897 A5 20080115

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI