Global Patent Index - EP 0854490 A3

EP 0854490 A3 2000-12-27 - Locking device for an electrical switch

Title (en)

Locking device for an electrical switch

Title (de)

Verklinkungseinrichtung für einen elektrischen Schalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'encliquetage pour un interrupteur électrique

Publication

EP 0854490 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100529 A

Priority

DE 19701470 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19701470C1] The arrangement has a contact lever (3) and an elbow joint (2,3) used to effect an over dead point position. The overstroke required to generate contact pressure and overcome tolerances and contact burn-off is produced by a movement which changes the length of one elbow joint arm. The arm of the elbow joint forming a latching lever acts directly on a contact lever rotatably mounted on a fixed axle. A switching lever (1) rotates about an axle (1B) and a latching lever is rotatably mounted in it in a bearing point in the form of an elongated hole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/50; H01H 71/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/526 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19701470 C1 19980102; EP 0854490 A2 19980722; EP 0854490 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040212

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR GB LI SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 71/50 A, 7H 01H 71/52 B

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI