Global Patent Index - EP 0854651 A3

EP 0854651 A3 2001-01-10 - Method and apparatus for encoding a contour of an object in a video signal

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for encoding a contour of an object in a video signal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung einer Objektkontur in einem Videosignal

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour le codage du contour d'un objet dans un signal vidéo

Publication

EP 0854651 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97303633 A

Priority

KR 19970000974 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0854651A2] A method for encoding a video signal of a contour of an object based on the iterated refinement technique determines a plurality of vertices on the contour; and calculates a contour pixel bit-number required to encode all the contour pixels and a vertex bit-number needed to encode all the vertices. After generating a determination signal representing the smaller of the contour pixel bit-number and the vertex bit-number, the method encodes contour information representing the vertices or the contour pixels based on the determination signal to generate a coded data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/26; G06T 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/24 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); G06T 9/20 (2006.01); H04N 1/41 (2006.01); H04N 19/00 (2014.01); H04N 19/12 (2014.01); H04N 19/134 (2014.01); H04N 19/196 (2014.01); H04N 19/20 (2014.01); H04N 19/50 (2014.01); H04N 19/85 (2014.01); H04N 19/91 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/20 (2013.01); H04N 19/20 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0614318 A2 19940907 - TOSHIBA KK [JP]
  • [A] EP 0707427 A2 19960417 - AT & T CORP [US]
  • [A] KEVIN O'CONNELL AND DAMON TULL (MOTOROLA): "Motorola MPEG-4 Contour-Coding Tool Technical Description", INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION - ORGANISATION INTERNATIONALE DE NORMALISATION,XX,XX, November 1995 (1995-11-01), pages COMPLETE12, XP002102834
  • [A] CHOO C Y ET AL: "An efficient technique for compressing chain-coded line drawing images", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TWENTY-SIXTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS (CAT. NO.92CH3245-8), PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA, 26-28 OCT. 1992, 1992, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 717 - 720 vol.2, XP002152065, ISBN: 0-8186-3160-0
  • [A] CHENG-CHANG LU ET AL: "HIGHLY EFFICIENT CODING SCHEMES FOR CONTOUR LINES BASED ON CHAIN CODE REPRESENTATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 39, no. 10, 1 October 1991 (1991-10-01), pages 1511 - 1514, XP000275313, ISSN: 0090-6778

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854651 A2 19980722; EP 0854651 A3 20010110; EP 0854651 B1 20070404; CN 1133326 C 20031231; CN 1188377 A 19980722; DE 69737549 D1 20070516; DE 69737549 T2 20071213; IN 193309 B 20040403; JP 4073982 B2 20080409; JP H10208061 A 19980807; KR 100239309 B1 20000115; US 5915045 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160529

2017-01-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69737549

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150510

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MAPLE VISION TECHNOLOGIES INC., CA

- Effective date: 20131226

2013-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAPLE VISION TECHNOLOGIES INC., CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP., SEOUL/SOUL, KR

- Document: DE 69737549

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69737549

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-05-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130404 AND 20130410

2013-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69737549

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69737549 P 20070516

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 7/26 A, 7G 06T 9/20 B

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL