Global patent index - EP 0854676 A4

EP 0854676 A4 2000-03-15 - SURFACTANTS PROVIDING ENHANCED EFFICACY AND/OR RAINFASTNESS TO PESTICIDE FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

SURFACTANTS PROVIDING ENHANCED EFFICACY AND/OR RAINFASTNESS TO PESTICIDE FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

TENSIDE, DIE PESTIZIDFORMULIERUNGEN ERHÖHTE WIRKSAMKEIT UND/ODER REGENFESTIGKEIT VERLEIHEN

Title (fr)

TENSIOACTIFS AMELIORANT L'EFFICACITE ET/OU LA RESISTANCE A L'ENTRAINEMENT PAR LA PLUIE DE FORMULATIONS DE PESTICIDES

Publication

EP 0854676 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96923316 A

Priority

  • US 9610467 W
  • US 49146695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700010A1] Alcohol surfactants such as ethoxylated Guerbet alcohol, are added to composition containing other surfactants to enhance the efficacy and/or rainfastness of herbicidal compositions containing glyphosate or its salts. The compositions of the invention may be in the form of concentrated compositions that are storage stable and water soluble or diluted solutions that can be directly applied to foliage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 25/30; A01N 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/30 (2006.01); A01N 57/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 57/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 57/20 + A01N 25/30
  2. A01N 57/20 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0582561 A1 19940209 - MONSANTO CO [US]
  • [X] EP 0531269 A2 19930310 - MONSANTO CO [US]
  • [Y] EP 0498785 A1 19920812 - MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE]
  • [Y] FR 2589328 A1 19870507 - STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]
  • [Y] TORR, R.F. ET AL: "RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE HERBICIDAL ACTIVITY AND FOLIAR UPTAKE OF SURFACTANT-CONTAINIG SOLUTIONS OF GLYPHOSATE APPLIED TO FOLIAGE OF OATS AND FIELD BEANS", CROP PROTECTION, vol. 13, no. 4, June 1994 (1994-06-01), LONDON (UK), pages 260 - 270, XP002126726, ISSN: 0031-9015
  • See also references of WO 9700010A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700010 A1 19970103; AU 6386396 A 19970115; AU 696607 B2 19980917; CA 2224364 A1 19970103; EP 0854676 A1 19980729; EP 0854676 A4 20000315; JP 3980640 B2 20070926; JP H11507673 A 19990706; NZ 312352 A 19991129

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030325

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WARNER, JAMES M.

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980102

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 980102;LV PAYMENT 980102;SI PAYMENT 980102