Global Patent Index - EP 0854683 B1

EP 0854683 B1 2001-12-12 - CHAIR

Title (en)

CHAIR

Title (de)

STUHL

Title (fr)

SIEGE

Publication

EP 0854683 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96931796 A

Priority

  • DE 19535032 A
  • EP 9604005 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19535032A1] The invention concerns a chair which comprises a seat surface (1) and a backrest (2) connected to each other and to at least one chair column (4) via an adjusting mechanism (3). The seat surface (1) rests on a front support rod and a rear support rod (30, 51). The front support rod (30) is connected in articulated manner to outer flanks (12) and at least one inner strip (31) at the front end thereof and at the opposite end to a guide bar (46). The rear support rod (51) is connected in articulated manner by at least one connection flank (48) to the backrest (2). The connection flank (48) is likewise articulated on the guide bar (46) and forms a common main axis of rotation (10) with the outer flanks (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032; A47C 7/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 7/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01); A47C 1/03283 (2013.01); A47C 7/402 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19535032 A1 19970327; AT 210400 T 20011215; EP 0854683 A1 19980729; EP 0854683 B1 20011212; WO 9710734 A1 19970327

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050912

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030912

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARIE WUBBEN

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608463 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210400 T 20011215

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991108

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980411

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI