Global Patent Index - EP 0854762 B1

EP 0854762 B1 2000-04-26 - CALIBRE CONTOUR IN A ROLLING MILL ROLLER FOR TUBES

Title (en)

CALIBRE CONTOUR IN A ROLLING MILL ROLLER FOR TUBES

Title (de)

KALIBERKONTUR DER WALZE EINES ROHRWALZWERKES

Title (fr)

CONTOUR DES CANNELURES DES CYLINDRES D'UN LAMINOIR A TUYAUX

Publication

EP 0854762 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96943860 A

Priority

  • DE 9601881 W
  • DE 19539408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19539408A1] The disclosure concerns a calibre contour in the substantially circular rollers of a reduction roller mill with three-high stands, intended in particular for use in rolling thick-walled tubes with wall thickness/diameter ratio which is greater than 0.25. The calibre contour of each roller (1) has a widening in the diameter (5) in the region of the contour floor in which the region of rolled material rolled to an upstream (in the direction of the roll) calibre can be deformed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19539408 A1 19970417; DE 19539408 C2 20030320; AR 003823 A1 19980909; CN 1068804 C 20010725; CN 1199355 A 19981118; DE 59605068 D1 20000531; EP 0854762 A2 19980729; EP 0854762 B1 20000426; JP 4012570 B2 20071121; JP H11513312 A 19991116; PL 180718 B1 20010330; PL 326154 A1 19980831; RU 2138347 C1 19990927; TW 314480 B 19970901; US 6065320 A 20000523; WO 9713595 A2 19970417; WO 9713595 A3 19970717

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605068

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59605068

2015-09-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605068

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605068 20000531

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980317

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT