Global Patent Index - EP 0854908 B1

EP 0854908 B1 2000-03-01 - DESCALING AND CLEANING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING CELLULOSE MICROFIBRILS

Title (en)

DESCALING AND CLEANING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING CELLULOSE MICROFIBRILS

Title (de)

KESSELSTEIN ENTFERNENDE REINIGUNGSFORMULIERUNGEN AUF BASIS MIKROFIBRILLIERTER CELLULOSE

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS DETARTRANTES ET NETTOYANTES A BASE DE MICROFIBRILLES DE CELLULOSE

Publication

EP 0854908 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96927113 A

Priority

  • FR 9601206 W
  • FR 9511697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9712954A1] A descaling composition containing cellulose microfibrils, wherein at least 80 % of the cells have primary walls and at most 20 % have secondary walls, with a crystallinity level no higher than 50 %. The pH of the composition is 1 or lower, and particularly 0.5 or lower.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2075 (2013.01); C11D 3/042 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712954 A1 19970410; AT 190088 T 20000315; AU 6704896 A 19970428; AU 697812 B2 19981015; BR 9610769 A 19990713; CA 2231512 A1 19970410; CN 1105171 C 20030409; CN 1201484 A 19981209; CZ 291536 B6 20030312; CZ 9800990 A3 19980812; DE 69606878 D1 20000406; DE 69606878 T2 20000817; EA 000499 B1 19990826; EA 199800265 A1 19981029; EP 0854908 A1 19980729; EP 0854908 B1 20000301; ES 2146011 T3 20000716; FR 2739394 A1 19970404; FR 2739394 B1 19971205; HU 9900048 A2 19990528; IL 123918 A 20010319; JP 3014768 B2 20000228; JP H11500176 A 19990106; KR 100256136 B1 20000515; MX 9802600 A 19981130; PL 325996 A1 19980817; PT 854908 E 20000630; TR 9800652 T1 19980622; US 5998349 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2013-04-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606878

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 190088 T

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-02-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146011 T3

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606878 20000406

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190088 T 20000315

2000-02-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: D. PERROTTA & C. S.A.S.

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990625

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980320

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE