Global Patent Index - EP 0855013 B1

EP 0855013 B1 2001-02-21 - CAPILLARY EVAPORATOR FOR DIPHASIC LOOP OF ENERGY TRANSFER BETWEEN A HOT SOURCE AND A COLD SOURCE

Title (en)

CAPILLARY EVAPORATOR FOR DIPHASIC LOOP OF ENERGY TRANSFER BETWEEN A HOT SOURCE AND A COLD SOURCE

Title (de)

KAPILLARVERDAMPFER FÜR ZWEIPHASIGEN KREISLAUF EINES ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS ZWISCHEN EINER WÄRMEQUELLE UND EINER KÄLTEQUELLE

Title (fr)

EVAPORATEUR CAPILLAIRE POUR BOUCLE DIPHASIQUE DE TRANSFERT D'ENERGIE ENTRE UNE SOURCE CHAUDE ET UNE SOURCE FROIDE

Publication

EP 0855013 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97936757 A

Priority

  • FR 9701470 W
  • FR 9610110 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2752291A1] The evaporator comprises a) a chamber (12) made of a porous material with an inlet for a heat exchanging fluid in liquid form, b) a shell (9) in which is located said chamber (12) to define around it, a chamber (15) for collecting said fluid in vapour form, said shell (9) having an outlet by which the vapour collected in said chamber (15) is evacuated. It further comprises a tube (22) which extends through the whole internal space of the chamber (12) with a porous wall, from one end (24) of the tube constituting the chamber (12) inlet for the heat exchanging fluid, said tube (22) being pierced over its whole length with holes (33) for injecting the heat exchanging liquid into the chamber (12) wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 15/02; F28D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/02 (2006.01); F28D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2752291 A1 19980213; FR 2752291 B1 19980925; CA 2234403 A1 19980219; DE 69704105 D1 20010329; DE 69704105 T2 20010802; EP 0855013 A1 19980729; EP 0855013 B1 20010221; ES 2156398 T3 20010616; JP H11514081 A 19991130; US 6058711 A 20000509; WO 9806992 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130808

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130808

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704105

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130808

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030809

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL D'*ETUDES SPATIALES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030809

2002-09-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156398 T3

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704105 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980401

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL