Global Patent Index - EP 0855146 B1

EP 0855146 B1 2001-12-05 - Method for making a fusible interlining and interlining obtained thereby

Title (en)

Method for making a fusible interlining and interlining obtained thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines einbügelbaren Einlagestoffs und so hergestelltes Produkt

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un entoilage thermocollant et entoilage thermocollant obtenu

Publication

EP 0855146 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98490005 A

Priority

FR 9700704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855146A1] The production of heat-adhesive cloth (I) comprises placing spots of thermofusible polymers (II) of average thickness E on the front of (I) and subjecting them to electron bombardment (III). (II) contains radical primers but no photo-inhibitor, and the depth of penetration of the electrons is regulated in such a manner as to alter the physical and chemical properties of (II), e.g. m. pt., viscosity, etc., to a depth e.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 27/06; D06M 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/02 (2006.01); A41D 27/06 (2006.01); C09J 7/02 (2006.01); C09J 123/04 (2006.01); D04H 1/58 (2006.01); D04H 1/60 (2006.01); D06M 10/00 (2006.01); D06M 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2013.01); D06M 10/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855146 A1 19980729; EP 0855146 B1 20011205; AR 014618 A1 20010328; AT 209865 T 20011215; AU 5214298 A 19980723; AU 729178 B2 20010125; BR 9800358 A 19990706; CA 2227397 A1 19980720; CA 2227397 C 20090317; CN 1122467 C 20031001; CN 1190555 A 19980819; CZ 297505 B6 20070103; CZ 9800184 A3 19980812; DE 69802717 D1 20020117; DE 69802717 T2 20020508; DK 0855146 T3 20020402; ES 2172105 T3 20020916; FR 2758443 A1 19980724; FR 2758443 B1 19990409; HK 1010819 A1 20040611; HU 9800093 A2 19990928; HU 9800093 A3 20000928; HU 9800093 D0 19980330; JP 4271744 B2 20090603; JP H10280213 A 19981020; KR 100456919 B1 20050125; MX 9800563 A 19981231; MY 124650 A 20060630; NO 980237 A 19980721; NO 980237 D0 19980119; PL 191374 B1 20060531; PL 324377 A1 19980803; PT 855146 E 20020531; RU 2161007 C2 20001227; SK 284794 B6 20051103; SK 7098 A3 19990413; TR 199800081 A2 19980821; US 5993918 A 19991130; ZA 9800444 B 19980729

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180121

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180119

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 209865 T

- Effective date: 20180120

2018-02-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180119

2018-01-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69802717

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090121

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-10-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-07-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070802

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-12 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172105 T3

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400787

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802717 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209865 T 20011215

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE BC

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

1999-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990107

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI