Global Patent Index - EP 0855159 A3

EP 0855159 A3 2001-01-03 - Seating and/or lying furniture

Title (en)

Seating and/or lying furniture

Title (de)

Sitz- und oder Liegemöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise et/ou de couchage

Publication

EP 0855159 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101362 A

Priority

DE 19702766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855159A2] The recliner and or seat part (2) can be swivelled on a horizontal axle (31) running the entire width of the frame (3). The axle is pivot mounted in a side, curved connecting part (30). The frame consists of two parallel side parts (20) each possessing a first frame part (21) resting on the ground. The side parts each have a second frame-part (22) continuing the first frame-part with an upward-leading curve, and extending upward over a quadrant. The top end of the second frame-part forms an arm-rest (22a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 3/023; A47C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/023 (2006.01); A47C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/024 (2013.01); A47C 3/023 (2013.01); A47C 7/405 (2013.01); A47C 9/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855159 A2 19980729; EP 0855159 A3 20010103; DE 19702766 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060530

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020411

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 3/023 A, 7A 47C 9/00 B

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI