Global Patent Index - EP 0855166 B1

EP 0855166 B1 2002-09-11 - Pull-out basket for dishwashing machine

Title (en)

Pull-out basket for dishwashing machine

Title (de)

Herausziehbarer Geschirrkorb für eine Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Panier extractible pour lave vaisselle

Publication

EP 0855166 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97122181 A

Priority

IT PN970004 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855166A2] The front wall (5) of the basket is provided with a handle (6) which is in the shape of a U turned upside down and has its arms (10) hinged, at a certain distance from the free end thereof and in such a manner as to be removable upon exertion of an elastic deformation force, on to fulcra (8). The arms (10) of the handle are so arranged as to strike against resting means (13, 14) that are provided on the front wall (5) both above and below said fulcra, respectively, in such a manner that the handle is normally locked in a position which is integral with the basket. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855166 A2 19980729; EP 0855166 A3 19980812; EP 0855166 B1 20020911; DE 69715364 D1 20021017; DE 69715364 T2 20030430; ES 2183072 T3 20030316; IT 243408 Y1 20020304; IT PN970004 U1 19980723

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121216

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715364

- Effective date: 20130702

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101217

2012-02-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120206

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101216

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101216

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040621

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183072 T3

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715364 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

1999-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990114

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI