Global patent index - EP 0855177 A3

EP 0855177 A3 2000-07-12 - Whitening powder

Title (en)

Whitening powder

Title (de)

Bleichendes Pulver

Title (fr)

Poudre de blanchissement

Publication

EP 0855177 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98100862 A

Priority

JP 2454497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855177A2] A whitening powder comprises the following ingredients: <TABLE> The whitening powder is substantially free of any powder coated with a fluorine compound, the weight ratio of the ingredient (B) to the ingredient (A) is at least 1, and the sum of the ingredient (B) and the ingredient (C) accounts for at least 80 wt.% of the whitening powder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/035; A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/25 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 8/98 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/25 (2013.01); A61K 8/34 (2013.01); A61K 8/676 (2013.01); A61K 8/982 (2013.01); A61Q 19/02 (2013.01); Y10S 514/844 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855177 A2 19980729; EP 0855177 A3 20000712; EP 0855177 B1 20041006; CA 2226996 A1 19980724; CA 2226996 C 20060815; CN 1140255 C 20040303; CN 1194824 A 19981007; DE 69826740 D1 20041111; DE 69826740 T2 20051006; HK 1012174 A1 20041210; TW 513312 B 20021211; US 6126926 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-12-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KOSE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69826740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030317

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI