EP 0855280 A3 19990310 - Record head
Title (en)
Record head
Title (de)
Aufzeichnungskopf
Title (fr)
Tête d'enregistrement
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 1438197 A 19970128
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0855280A2] A record head is constituted such that an ink storage groove for temporarily storing ink on a substrate is formed along a longitudinal direction of a slit, the ink storage groove is disposed in an ink chamber formed between the substrate and the slit plate and is disposed at an upper side, or a lower side both sides of the slit in a direction of a face of the substrate by which a sufficient amount of ink is stably supplied to the slip portion at high speed and prevention of discharge phenomenon and acceleration of the record speed are achieved. Also, a record head having a photoconductive film formed on a transparent electrode, means for supplying ink on the photoconductive film, and light irradiating means for supplying light on to the photoconductive film in a form of a pulse and in correspondence with a desired pixel. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 2/04 (2013.01); B41J 2/06 (2013.01); B41J 2002/061 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 5534898 A 19960709 - KASHINO TOSHIO [JP], et al
- [A] US 3484162 A 19691216 - CLARK HAROLD E
- [A] EP 0268277 A2 19880525 - CANON KK [JP]
- [A] WO 9525637 A1 19950928 - SPECTRA INC [US]
- [A] EP 0670220 A2 19950906 - CANON KK [JP]
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 623 (M - 1511) 17 November 1993 (1993-11-17)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 58 (P - 261) 16 March 1984 (1984-03-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 391 (P - 649) 22 December 1987 (1987-12-22)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 177 (M - 233) 5 August 1983 (1983-08-05)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 122 (M - 1226) 27 March 1992 (1992-03-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 96, no. 8 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 256 (M - 980) 4 June 1990 (1990-06-04)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0855280 A2 19980729; EP 0855280 A3 19990310; JP H10202882 A 19980804
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98300566 A 19980127; JP 1438197 A 19970128