Global Patent Index - EP 0855324 A3

EP 0855324 A3 2000-03-01 - Automatic open/close operation system for train door

Title (en)

Automatic open/close operation system for train door

Title (de)

Automatisches Steuerungssystem für das Öffnen/ Schliessen von einer Tür eines Zuges

Title (fr)

Système de commande automatique pour l'ouverture/la fermeture d'une porte d'un train.

Publication

EP 0855324 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98100745 A

Priority

JP 909797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855324A2] An automatic train door open/close system includes a person recognition apparatus 1 for recognising the presence of person near the train door 4, implementing timetable control means 21 for controlling the operation of the train based on a train timetable, means 22 for detecting a timing for closing the door based on the person recognition apparatus at the departure of the train, a control output editing means 23 for outputting open/close control signals to the train door by editing control information on the door close operation, and a detected result display apparatus 3 for indicating whether or not the timing for closing the door is detected. When a timing for closing the cannot be detected by any reason, such as crowded passengers or the like, this condition is informed to the train operator, and a manual door close operation is proposed after confirming the condition near the door. Safety of the passengers is thus ensured. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/02; E05F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/02 (2006.01); F01L 1/04 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 169 (M - 1239) 23 April 1992 (1992-04-23)
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 07 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 258 (M - 838) 15 June 1989 (1989-06-15)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 267 (M - 1133) 8 July 1991 (1991-07-08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855324 A2 19980729; EP 0855324 A3 20000301; EP 0855324 B1 20030409; DE 69813052 D1 20030515; DE 69813052 T2 20040304; JP H10203361 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813052

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110116

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110116

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI