Global Patent Index - EP 0855325 B1

EP 0855325 B1 2001-12-05 - Guiding, displacement and locking device for sliding sides of freight cars

Title (en)

Guiding, displacement and locking device for sliding sides of freight cars

Title (de)

Führungs-, Ausstell- und Arretiereinrichtung für Schiebewände von Güterwagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage, de déplacement et de blocage pour parois coulissantes de wagons à marchandises

Publication

EP 0855325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250008 A

Priority

DE 19701887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855325A1] The slide doors (1) of the roof section are provided with guide rails, and the roof sections cover a ridge support (2) located between the end walls (1) and a central portal (3). A locking, hooking and guiding element (7) on the central portal, and a locking and hooking lever (6) on an end wall are directly concentrically connected to each other via a torsion-free shaft (11). The shaft is located in the region of the locking element and the locking lever and is located eccentric to their pivot points. The transmission of force in the region of the lever as well as the element is achieved by multi-link plane gearing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 39/00; B61D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/08 (2006.01); B61D 19/00 (2006.01); B61D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/006 (2013.01); B61D 17/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19701887 A1 19980723; DE 19701887 C2 20020425; AT 210039 T 20011215; CZ 293079 B6 20040218; CZ 9800165 A3 19980812; DK 0855325 T3 20020211; EP 0855325 A1 19980729; EP 0855325 B1 20011205; ES 2168149 T3 20020601; HU 222319 B1 20030628; HU 9800086 A2 20010129; HU 9800086 D0 19980330; PL 186521 B1 20040130; PL 324376 A1 19980803; SI 0855325 T1 20020630; SK 284094 B6 20040908; SK 7298 A3 19990111

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU G.M.B.H. *DWA

- Effective date: 20060131

2007-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20070821

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060112

2006-01-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-02-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-11 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2005-01-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-16 [REG ES NF1A] RESTORATION GRANTED

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-07-01 [REG ES NE1A] REQUEST FOR RESTORATION

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168149 T3

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-01-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020114

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981006

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210039 T 20011215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

1999-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH

1999-05-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

1999-04-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 981006

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981006

1998-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERNST, ANDREAS, DIPL.-ING.

1998-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REMMLING, KLAUS, DIPL.-ING.

1998-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETRICK, RENEE, DIPL.-ING.

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI