Global Patent Index - EP 0855326 A3

EP 0855326 A3 2000-01-19 - Two axled running gear for trackbound transport systems

Title (en)

Two axled running gear for trackbound transport systems

Title (de)

Zweiachsiges Fahrwerk für schienengebundene Transportsysteme

Title (fr)

Train de roulement avec deux essieux pour système de transport sur rails.

Publication

EP 0855326 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250004 A

Priority

DE 19703701 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10203362A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To install easily and realize a favorable maintenance characteristic by dividing a running device frame to two half parts between wheel pairs and connecting respective running device half parts adjustably by a link combination in a running plane and slidably in a running direction. SOLUTION: Axles 3a, 3b are provided with wheel pairs 2a, 2b supported in housings 4a, 4b, which are formed as running device frame half parts respectively and in which wheel pair transmission devices 5a, 5b are also arranged. Frame parts 7a, 7b are provided with car rooms 6a, 6b connected each other through a connection rod 8. Rotation joint members 11a consisting of two parts are arranged in these mutually facing sides between the housings 4a, 4b and two rotation joint members 11a are connected by a joint projection piece 11. The connection rod 8 is also divided to two parts and the joint projection piece 11 is inserted in the guide hole of the center of a lateral material 15 provided between both rod materials 8a, 8b.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 3/12; B61F 3/04; B61F 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/12 (2006.01); B61G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/02 (2013.01); B61F 3/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703701 A1 19980723; DE 19703701 C2 19981210; AT 221482 T 20020815; DK 0855326 T3 20020902; EP 0855326 A2 19980729; EP 0855326 A3 20000119; EP 0855326 B1 20020731; ES 2176907 T3 20021201; JP 4068205 B2 20080326; JP H10203362 A 19980804; PT 855326 E 20021231; US 6021718 A 20000208

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090109

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090108

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090109

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090109

2010-02-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090804

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-10-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-07-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080304

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Free text: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FORSTSTRASSE 16#40597 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FORSTSTRASSE 16#40597 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2004-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-06-30 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Free text: DEMAG MOBILE CRANES GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2003-11-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Free text: DEMAG MOBILE CRANES GMBH#DINGLERSTRASSE 24#66482 ZWEIBRUECKEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FORSTSTRASSE 16#40597 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2003-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.FORSTSTRASSE 16,

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-12-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403531

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176907 T3

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804945 20020905

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221482 T 20020815

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG MOBILE CRANES GMBH

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000213

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LV;MK;RO;SI