Global Patent Index - EP 0855338 A3

EP 0855338 A3 2000-03-01 - Modular boat system

Title (en)

Modular boat system

Title (de)

Modulares Bootssystem

Title (fr)

Système bateau modulaire

Publication

EP 0855338 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101062 A

Priority

DE 19702844 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855338A2] The floating body modules (10a, 10b), connecting modules (12, 13) and basic modules (11, 16, 16b) can be produced in different sizes and in these sizes arbitrarily combinable with one another. The floating body modules in their central body section have a recess (10c) for locating and fixation of the connecting modules and basic modules. The tubular connecting modules are provided with holes for the fixture pins of the floating body modules, together with components of all drive and usage types, e.g. of the mast, rudder or engines of different kinds. The basic module (11, 16) is of loadable and waterproof material and is insertable in the space formed by the connecting module between the two floating body modules, thus creating a dry usage space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 7/02; B63B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/12 (2006.01); B63B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 7/04 (2013.01); B63B 1/121 (2013.01); B63B 2001/145 (2013.01); B63B 2003/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855338 A2 19980729; EP 0855338 A3 20000301; DE 19702844 C1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-12-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI