Global patent index - EP 0855364 B1

EP 0855364 B1 2001-04-11 - Supply module for liquids or similar products and use in beverage dispensers

Title (en)

Supply module for liquids or similar products and use in beverage dispensers

Title (de)

Versorgungseinheit für Flüssigkeiten oder ähnliche Produkte und Anwndung in Getränk-Abgabevorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Bloc d'alimentation en produits liquides ou analogues et application aux distributeurs de boissons

Publication

EP 0855364 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400085 A

Priority

FR 9700715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855364A1] The dispenser consists of a feed tube (2) of a supple and elastic material with an inlet (3) and an outlet (4), a clamp (5) for closing the tube, and housing (8) of a rigid material. The housing has a through channel (9) with an inlet (10) and outlet (11), the inlet being connected by a sleeve (12) to the outlet end of the feed tube. The dispenser also has at least one tube (13) for injecting a sterilising fluid through a sealed channel (20) from the outside (21) of the housing (8). The tube (13) has a section (22) which lies coaxially with the sleeve (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855364 A1 19980729; EP 0855364 B1 20010411; DE 69800672 D1 20010517; DE 69800672 T2 20011129; ES 2157642 T3 20010816; FR 2758543 A1 19980724; FR 2758543 B1 19990326

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120120

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69800672

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120119

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BONDOUX GERARD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-02-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157642

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-06-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800672

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990319

1999-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990102

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI