Global Patent Index - EP 0855375 B9

EP 0855375 B9 2002-09-25 - Use of adenine derivatives for systemically enhancing the migration and distribution of nutrients in plants

Title (en)

Use of adenine derivatives for systemically enhancing the migration and distribution of nutrients in plants

Title (de)

Verwendung von Adeninderivaten zur systemischen Förderung der Migration und Abgabe von Pflanzennährstoffe

Title (fr)

Utilisation de dérivés d'adénine comme agents favorisant par systémie la migration et la distribution des éléments nutritifs et fertilisants chez la plante

Publication

EP 0855375 B9 (FR)

Application

EP 98400150 A

Priority

FR 9700763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855375A2] Use of natural or synthetic adenine derivatives, or algal extracts rich in these, as foliar treatment agents to aid the migration and distribution within plants of nitrogenous nutrients and fertilisers and/or substances rich in trace elements, and also as nutrients or fertilisers in crude form, is new.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05F 11/00; C05F 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C05F 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C05F 11/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855375 A2 19980729; EP 0855375 A3 19990324; EP 0855375 B1 20010919; EP 0855375 B9 20020925; AT 205819 T 20011015; DE 69801688 D1 20011025; DE 69801688 T2 20020620; DK 0855375 T3 20020121; ES 2165131 T3 20020301; FR 2758816 A1 19980731; FR 2758816 B1 19990416; PT 855375 E 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180202

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 205819 T

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-03-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-02-21 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2018-02-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180125

2018-01-31 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-29 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-01-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69801688

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOCIETE D'ENGRAIS COMPOSES MINERAUX ET AMENDEMENT

- Free text: SOCIETE D'ENGRAIS COMPOSES MINERAUX ET AMENDEMENTS (S.E.C.M.A.)#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE#F-22260 PONTRIEUX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SOCIETE D'ENGRAIS COMPOSES MINERAUX ET AMENDEMENTS (S.E.C.M.A.)#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE#F-22260 PONTRIEUX (FR)

2003-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-09-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20010402461

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165131 T3

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-01-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801688 20011025

2001-10-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205819 T 20011015

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000307

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990510

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI