Global Patent Index - EP 0855457 A3

EP 0855457 A3 2000-10-18 - Fluff suppressing device for an automatic winding machine

Title (en)

Fluff suppressing device for an automatic winding machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Unterdrückung von Fusseln in einer Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suppression de peluches pour une machine à bobiner automatique

Publication

EP 0855457 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97123032 A

Priority

  • JP 1270197 A
  • JP 2045397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855457A2] With the aim of providing, in an automatic winding machine, a fluff suppressing device that can reliably suppress the fluffs by changing and controlling the rotation speed of the nip rollers as the diameter of the cone package winding yarn increases. The fluff suppressing device of the present invention used in an automatic winding machine that winds yarn on a cone package by nipping yarn between a pair of nip rollers 5 provided on the yarn path to suppress the fluffs comprises a rotation speed control means 50 used to change the rotation speed of the nip rollers 5 as the diameter of the cone package 8 becomes larger. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/08; D01H 7/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855457 A2 19980729; EP 0855457 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040826

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 02G 1/08 A, 7D 01H 7/92 B

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI