Global Patent Index - EP 0855484 B1

EP 0855484 B1 2003-06-25 - Elongate hollow tubular mast

Title (en)

Elongate hollow tubular mast

Title (de)

Länglicher, rohrförmiger Hohlmast

Title (fr)

Mât allongé, creux et tubulaire

Publication

EP 0855484 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97310696 A

Priority

  • EP 97310696 A
  • EP 97200146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855484A1] An elongate hollow tubular mast (1) surrounding an interior space, the mast having a first wall opening (25) in a longitudinal section for access to the interior space, an inner tubular reinforcing member (15) within the longitudinal section bordering the first wall opening (25), and a second wall opening (27) in the reinforcing member in register with the first wall opening (25) defining an access opening (9) for the mast. The reinforcing member (15) includes an integrally formed, axially extending, longitudinally elongate, rib structure (17) projecting from an inner surface of the reinforcing member (15) opposite the access opening (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855484 A1 19980729; EP 0855484 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171230

2018-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 243802 T

- Effective date: 20171231

2018-01-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171230

2018-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-03 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171230

2017-12-31 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69723043

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.

- Free text: HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.#PIEKSTRAAT 2#3071 EL ROTTERDAM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.#PIEKSTRAAT 2#3071 EL ROTTERDAM (NL)

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723043 P 20030731

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010926

1999-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980812

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI