Global Patent Index - EP 0855520 B1

EP 0855520 B1 2001-05-02 - Valve arrangement

Title (en)

Valve arrangement

Title (de)

Ventilanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de soupape

Publication

EP 0855520 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100431 A

Priority

DE 19702948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0855520A1] The valve member (8) has an activation surface (42), which for movement of the valve member is activatable with a control medium under operting pressure, which is feedable from the pressure medium source via a control channel (43) governed by a control valve (3). Connected in the control channel is a pressure regulator (58) for creating the operating pressure. The pressure regulator is connected in the inflow side channel section (38) of the control channel (43) ahead of the control valve for the pressure medium source. The pressure regulator is not adjustable and simply provides a specific operating pressure, or it can be stagelessly adjustable for provision of different desired operating pressures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/042; F15B 11/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/05 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/05 (2013.01); F15B 13/0402 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0855520 A1 19980729; EP 0855520 B1 20010502; EP 0855520 B2 20041006; DE 19702948 A1 19980730; DE 19702948 C2 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800655

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800655

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100113

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-09-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-01-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-05 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-10-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-03-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800655 20010607

2001-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RAPISARDI S.R.L.

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980622

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI