Global Patent Index - EP 0855866 B1

EP 0855866 B1 2002-09-25 - CLASP WITH BUTTON

Title (en)

CLASP WITH BUTTON

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS MIT KNOPF

Title (fr)

FERMOIR A BOUTON

Publication

EP 0855866 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97921578 A

Priority

  • CH 9700214 W
  • CH 163496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800042A1] The invention discloses an unfolding clasp for a wrist watch, with at least one unfolding arm (1, 2) articulated with respect to a base strip (3), having a locking means (4) arranged on the base strip (3). The said locking means (4) comprises a mobile piece (4.5), to be locked with an inclined end face (1.1, 2.1) of the said at least one unfolding arm (1, 2) folded down by moving the said mobile piece (4.5) in a plane (TT') substantially perpendicular to the opening/closing plane (OO') of the said at least one folding arm (1, 2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2166 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800042 A1 19980108; AU 2761397 A 19980121; CH 690894 A5 20010228; DE 69715805 D1 20021031; DE 69715805 T2 20030515; EP 0855866 A1 19980805; EP 0855866 B1 20020925; HK 1009070 A1 20030228; JP 3632030 B2 20050323; JP H11511684 A 19991012; US 6119315 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050527

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050527

2004-06-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A, CH

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715805 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VACHERON & CONSTANTIN S.A.

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980213

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI