Global Patent Index - EP 0855910 A4

EP 0855910 A4 2000-07-05 - CONJUGATES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF BENIGN PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA

Title (en)

CONJUGATES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF BENIGN PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA

Title (de)

VERWENDBARE KONJUGATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER GUTARTIGEN PROSTATEHYPERPLASIE

Title (fr)

CONJUGUES UTILES POUR TRAITER L'ADENOME PROSTATIQUE BENIN

Publication

EP 0855910 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96936504 A

Priority

  • GB 9602903 A
  • US 9616490 W
  • US 566495 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9714416A1] Novel pharmaceutical compositions useful for the treatment of benign prostatic hyperplasia which comprises novel oligopeptides, which are selectively cleaved by enzymatically active PSA, in conjugation with a cytotoxic agent are described. Methods of treating benign prostate hypertrophy are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/40; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/70; A61K 38/02; A61K 38/07; A61K 38/08; A61K 38/10; A61K 38/14; A61K 47/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 15/252 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/24 (2006.01); A61K 31/335 (2006.01); A61K 31/337 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/407 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/513 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/529 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7028 (2006.01); A61K 31/7034 (2006.01); A61K 31/704 (2006.01); A61K 31/7042 (2006.01); A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 47/48338 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0247792 A2 19871202 - LILLY CO ELI [US]
  • [A] WO 9210212 A1 19920625 - ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]
  • [A] EP 0282057 A2 19880914 - UNIV MICHIGAN [US]
  • [A] LILJA ET AL.: "Molecular cloning of epididymal and seminal vesicular transcripts encoding a semenogelin-related protein", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, vol. 89, May 1992 (1992-05-01), pages 4559 - 4563, XP002137094
  • [A] TESSMER ET AL.: "Biological activity of prostate-specific antigen isolated...", ELECTROPHORESIS, vol. 16, no. 5, May 1995 (1995-05-01), pages 793 - 799, XP000901881
  • See also references of WO 9714416A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9714416 A1 19970424; AU 708475 B2 19990805; AU 7432196 A 19970507; EP 0855910 A1 19980805; EP 0855910 A4 20000705; JP 2000506494 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031204

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/40 A, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 38/02 B, 7A 61K 38/07 B, 7A 61K 38/08 B, 7A 61K 38/10 B, 7A 61K 38/14 B, 7A 61K 47/48 B

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980518

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE