Global patent index - EP 0855931 A4

EP 0855931 A4 2000-02-23 - SELF-CLEANING FLUID FILTER UNIT

Title (en)

SELF-CLEANING FLUID FILTER UNIT

Title (de)

SELBSTREINIGENDE EINHEIT ZUR FILTRATION VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

UNITE AUTO-NETTOYANTE DE FILTRAGE DE FLUIDES

Publication

EP 0855931 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96930617 A

Priority

  • US 9613822 W
  • US 290495 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707869A1] A high volume, self-cleaning filter unit (10) includes at least one cage support (18) with a downwardly angled surface having a direct path filter media (12) sealed thereto, with a suction source (14) to extract filtered fluid from the interior of the cage support (18). During operation of the filtering, particulates clog the filter media (12), and a backwashing (16) is effected by either backflushing with air or the fluid being filtered. Extremely high volumes of fluid can be filtered to a high degree, generally on the order of a few microns, in one step with a very economical filter unit (10). The downwardly angled surface holds the filter media (12) in such a position that a small mesh filter cloth is filtering a nominal size of particles out of the fluid. Oil is rejected by the filter unit (10) at a high rate, making this an effective oil/water separator as well.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 24/08; B01D 24/44; B01D 29/01; B01D 29/05; B01D 29/15; B01D 29/68; B01D 29/86; B01D 35/02; B01D 35/05; B01D 35/22; B01D 35/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/01 (2006.01); B01D 35/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/01 (2013.01); B01D 35/05 (2013.01); B01D 2201/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B01D 29/01 + B01D 29/114 + B01D 29/52 + B01D 29/66 + B01D 29/86
  2. B01D 35/05 + B01D 35/12

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9707869A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707869 A1 19970306; EP 0855931 A1 19980805; EP 0855931 A4 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-14 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-01-10 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2000-12-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-02-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01D 24/08 A, 7B 01D 24/44 B, 7B 01D 29/05 B, 7B 01D 29/15 B, 7B 01D 29/68 B, 7B 01D 29/86 B, 7B 01D 35/02 B, 7B 01D 35/05 B, 7B 01D 35/31 B, 7B 01D 35/22 B, 7B 01D 29/01 B

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980330

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE