Global Patent Index - EP 0855940 B1

EP 0855940 B1 2000-03-08 - METHOD OF REPAIRING COATING DEFECTS

Title (en)

METHOD OF REPAIRING COATING DEFECTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUSBESSERN VON BESCHICHTUNGSFEHLERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REPARER DES DEFAUTS DE REVETEMENT

Publication

EP 0855940 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934693 A

Priority

  • DE 19539065 A
  • EP 9604481 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19539065A1] The invention concerns a method of repairing defects (2) which only cover a small area on a surface coating on a flat component (3), e.g. a vehicle bodywork part, by means of a number of repair tools (44, 45) which are used in sequence, the surface affected by the repair work being restricted essentially to the area covered by the defect (2). In order to ensure easy handling of the individual repair tools (44, 45) and rapid execution of the repair work for the same repair quality, the invention proposes that the repair tools (44, 45) are mounted in such a way that they are aligned and coordinated with respect to each other in a defined way and moved, mounted on a common mounting (1; 103), into the area of the defect (2). After positioning the mounting (1; 103) on the flat component (3) and setting the first (44) of the repair tools (44, 45) in position by means of preferably optical adjustment means (42, 43), additional repair tools (45) reach their correct working position due to the movement of the tool carrier (27; 100) carrying them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 6/00 (2006.01); B05C 11/00 (2006.01); B05D 3/12 (2006.01); B05D 5/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/12 (2013.01); B05D 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19539065 A1 19970424; EP 0855940 A1 19980805; EP 0855940 B1 20000308; ES 2143235 T3 20000501; JP H11513611 A 19991124; US 6187375 B1 20010213; WO 9715403 A1 19970501

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604614

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143235 T3

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604614 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990816

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE