Global Patent Index - EP 0855941 B1

EP 0855941 B1 2000-01-19 - A DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFICATION AND SEPARATION OF PARTICLES IN CEREAL MILLING PROCESS

Title (en)

A DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFICATION AND SEPARATION OF PARTICLES IN CEREAL MILLING PROCESS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND APPARAT FÜR DIE KLASSIFIZIERUNG UND TRENNUNG VON TEILCHEN IM GETREIDEMAHLVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL DE TRI ET DE SEPARATION DE PARTICULES DANS UN PROCEDE DE BROYAGE DE CEREALES

Publication

EP 0855941 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96934686 A

Priority

  • EP 9604474 W
  • US 566895 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9714513A1] A device for the classification and separation of particles in cereal milling process having: a connection to connect the device to a feeder section (2), ahead of a screen deck (4) of a purifier, a fluidizing bed (15) to support the particles, a pressure chamber (16) arranged under the fluidizing bed (15), a compressed gas source (18), a gas inlet port (23) in the chamber (16) for connecting the compressed gas source (18) with the chamber (16). So that in the pressure chamber (16) a pressure higher than atmospheric pressure is achieved. The fluidizing bed (15) is gas permeable so that a gas passing through the gas inlet port (23) and through the fluidizing bed (15) can accomplish a stratification of the particles, according to density.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 9/02; B07B 4/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 4/08 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01); B07B 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 4/08 (2013.01); B07B 9/00 (2013.01); B07B 11/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9714513 A1 19970424; EP 0855941 A1 19980805; EP 0855941 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-10-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KEMENY AG PATENTANWALTBUERO

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH ES IT LI

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990331

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980227

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH ES IT LI